U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Oliviera
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Passport Returned]
November, 2016
  • November 14, 2016: [Prob 35 Order Term Probation / SR]
September, 2015
  • September 25, 2015: [Judgment]
  • September 25, 2015: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • September 24, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • September 21, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2015
  • August 10, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 10, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • August 06, 2015: [Continue ]
July, 2015
  • July 27, 2015: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 27, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 21, 2015: [Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2015
  • March 13, 2015: [Waiver of Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.