U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:05-cr-00233-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Newton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 04, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • September 04, 2019: [Status Conference]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Status Conference]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2017
  • October 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 12, 2017: [Continue ]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 18, 2016: [Extension of Time]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 31, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 29, 2016: [Order]
November, 2015
  • November 04, 2015: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
August, 2015
  • August 20, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
March, 2015
  • March 17, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.