U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:07-cr-00299-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Arias et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order re: USSC Amendment]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • September 26, 2024: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 26, 2024: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • August 18, 2021: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • August 03, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • July 23, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • July 23, 2021: [Seal]
  • July 23, 2021: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
April, 2021
  • April 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2020
  • June 15, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [USM Return Unexecuted]
  • November 15, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • November 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Dismiss ]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
March, 2016
  • March 24, 2016: [Sealed Document]
December, 2015
  • December 16, 2015: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • December 16, 2015: [Order on Miscelleneous Motion re Reduction of Sentence USSC Amendment]
  • December 16, 2015: [Appoint Counsel re Reduction of Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • December 16, 2015: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • December 16, 2015: [Miscellaneous Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence - USSC Amendment]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • November 19, 2015: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
September, 2015
  • September 08, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2015
  • August 27, 2015: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
March, 2015
  • March 24, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.