U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00219-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Robinson-Cowan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 11, 2017: [Restitution Order]
  • May 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 05, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2015
  • December 10, 2015: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • December 10, 2015: [Judgment]
  • December 04, 2015: [Document Unsealed]
  • December 03, 2015: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • December 03, 2015: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • December 03, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • December 03, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
November, 2015
  • November 20, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • November 20, 2015: [Seal]
  • November 16, 2015: [Sealed Motion]
  • November 12, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 12, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
October, 2015
  • October 19, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2015
  • March 25, 2015: [Waiver of Sentencing Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.