U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:11-cr-00046-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Morrison
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2015
  • September 04, 2015: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
August, 2015
  • August 28, 2015: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • August 14, 2015: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • August 12, 2015: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • August 12, 2015: [Violation Report]
March, 2015
  • March 25, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.