U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:11-cr-00244-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jerrick
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [USM Return Executed]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
September, 2018
  • September 09, 2018: [Transcript]
August, 2018
  • August 07, 2018: [Order]
December, 2017
  • December 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 04, 2017: [Order]
July, 2017
  • July 11, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
June, 2017
  • June 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document ]
  • June 08, 2017: [Unseal Document]
April, 2017
  • April 07, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 07, 2017: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • February 22, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 16, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
  • February 16, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • February 16, 2017: [Violation Report]
March, 2015
  • March 25, 2015: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.