U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cherry Hill Construction, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2015
  • December 14, 2015: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • December 14, 2015: [Judgment]
  • December 08, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • December 02, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2015
  • August 10, 2015: [Order]
July, 2015
  • July 02, 2015: [Scheduling Conference]
  • July 01, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2015
  • June 25, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
March, 2015
  • March 26, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.