U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00045-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Zelepos
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2015
  • October 02, 2015: [Forfeiture of Property ]
August, 2015
  • August 24, 2015: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • August 24, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • August 19, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • July 28, 2015: [Travel ]
  • July 06, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 01, 2015: [Continue ]
June, 2015
  • June 30, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 15, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
March, 2015
  • March 31, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.