U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:06-cr-00307-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tate
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 09, 2021: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • September 09, 2021: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 18, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • August 17, 2021: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • August 17, 2021: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order of Transfer]
June, 2015
  • June 29, 2015: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 29, 2015: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
April, 2015
  • April 06, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.