U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00034-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bratsenis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 11, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • October 03, 2022: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • October 03, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2022
  • July 10, 2022: [Restitution Order]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 05, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • April 05, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 05, 2022: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • April 05, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 05, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 05, 2022: [Dismiss ]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • March 31, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • March 31, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 29, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 22, 2022: [Transcript]
  • February 21, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • February 15, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order]
  • February 07, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • February 06, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Status Conference]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
  • July 16, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • July 13, 2021: [Extension of Time]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Order]
  • June 15, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
May, 2021
  • May 07, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
  • May 06, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 06, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 16, 2021: [Seal]
  • April 16, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
  • April 16, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 16, 2021: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 16, 2021: [Order]
  • April 15, 2021: [Continue ]
March, 2021
  • March 05, 2021: [Sealed Order]
  • March 05, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • March 05, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Continue ]
  • February 18, 2021: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
December, 2020
  • December 02, 2020: [Continue ]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • November 23, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 20, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • November 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • November 18, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
  • November 18, 2020: [Seal]
  • November 02, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Continue ]
August, 2020
  • August 13, 2020: [Order for PSI and Report]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • November 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 18, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 18, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 16, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • October 10, 2019: [Sealed Motion]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: [Waiver of Sentencing Time]
October, 2017
  • October 25, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 24, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2017
  • June 13, 2017: [Notice]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • February 27, 2017: [Judgment]
  • February 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 22, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • February 22, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • February 14, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 08, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 03, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • February 03, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • November 22, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • November 14, 2016: [Continue ]
October, 2016
  • October 05, 2016: [Order Referring Plea]
  • October 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 30, 2016: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • September 30, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • September 30, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 29, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 29, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 23, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • September 21, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 21, 2016: [Status Conference]
August, 2016
  • August 24, 2016: [Continue ]
July, 2016
  • July 21, 2016: [Continue ]
  • July 21, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • July 21, 2016: [Seal]
  • July 21, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2016
  • June 07, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • June 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • June 06, 2016: [Notice]
  • June 03, 2016: [Continue ]
  • June 03, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • June 03, 2016: [Seal]
  • June 02, 2016: [Status Conference]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Continue ]
  • April 27, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 26, 2016: [Continue ]
  • April 25, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • April 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 22, 2016: [Continue ]
  • April 15, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 06, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 04, 2016: [Continue ]
March, 2016
  • March 11, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [Order]
  • February 25, 2016: [Disclosure ]
  • February 25, 2016: [Sever Defendant]
  • February 25, 2016: [Discovery]
  • February 11, 2016: [Trial Memo]
January, 2016
  • January 14, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 14, 2016: [Scheduling Conference]
  • January 07, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 07, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • January 07, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
December, 2015
  • December 23, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 21, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • December 21, 2015: [Indictment]
  • December 18, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 18, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 18, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 18, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 18, 2015: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • December 18, 2015: [Information - Felony]
November, 2015
  • November 03, 2015: [Order of Transfer]
  • November 01, 2015: [Order]
October, 2015
  • October 01, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
September, 2015
  • September 09, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • September 09, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 09, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 09, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 09, 2015: [Order of Detention]
August, 2015
  • August 21, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 20, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • August 20, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 20, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 13, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 11, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
July, 2015
  • July 23, 2015: [Indictment]
  • July 15, 2015: [Order]
  • July 06, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 02, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 02, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 01, 2015: [Continue ]
  • July 01, 2015: [Extension of Time]
June, 2015
  • June 11, 2015: [Approve Associate Counsel]
April, 2015
  • April 10, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.