U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:10-cr-00165-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Kottage et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Sealed Document]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order of Transfer]
  • January 06, 2023: [Sealed Document]
  • January 06, 2023: [Sealed Motion]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Order]
  • September 28, 2020: [Stipulation]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • January 15, 2020: [USM Return Executed]
  • January 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • January 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 08, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 08, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 06, 2020: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Hearing ]
  • December 05, 2019: [Sealed Order]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • October 21, 2019: [Order of Transfer]
  • October 18, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • October 18, 2019: [Seal]
  • October 18, 2019: [Application for Writ]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
  • January 12, 2018: [Passport Returned]
January, 2017
  • January 09, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • May 25, 2016: [Notice of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • May 25, 2016: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
July, 2015
  • July 06, 2015: [Writ Returned]
April, 2015
  • April 13, 2015: [Sealed Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.