U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00054-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tanner
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 19, 2017: [Notice of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • July 19, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • July 19, 2017: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
November, 2016
  • November 16, 2016: [Passport Returned]
  • November 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PreTrial ]
  • November 04, 2016: [Return of Passport]
August, 2016
  • August 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 04, 2016: [Extension of Time]
June, 2016
  • June 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 02, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2016
  • May 04, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • May 04, 2016: [Judgment]
  • May 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • May 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 03, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • May 03, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 03, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • May 03, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Payment]
  • April 26, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • April 26, 2016: [Seal]
  • April 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • April 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 12, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • April 12, 2016: [Seal]
  • April 12, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 12, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 08, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 08, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • April 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 04, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • March 21, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2016
  • February 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 04, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • January 20, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • January 20, 2016: [Seal]
  • January 20, 2016: [Continue ]
December, 2015
  • December 16, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • December 16, 2015: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • December 16, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 16, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 16, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 04, 2015: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
November, 2015
  • November 18, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 12, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • November 06, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 04, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
  • November 03, 2015: [Order of Transfer]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Order]
  • October 09, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 09, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 09, 2015: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 08, 2015: [Continue ]
  • October 06, 2015: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2015
  • July 27, 2015: [Surety Information Sheet]
  • July 15, 2015: [Continue ]
  • July 08, 2015: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 08, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 08, 2015: [Release from Custody ]
April, 2015
  • April 13, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.