U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:96-cr-00186-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perez, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • September 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 20, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 16, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 16, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order]
  • September 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 24, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2015
  • December 04, 2015: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
June, 2015
  • June 17, 2015: [Order of Transfer]
April, 2015
  • April 20, 2015: [Document re Reduction of Sentence re: Crack Cocaine 18:3582]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.