U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:01-cr-00006-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Rodriguez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • February 26, 2018: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • February 20, 2018: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • February 13, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 08, 2018: [Violation Report]
  • February 08, 2018: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
January, 2018
  • January 12, 2018: [Calendar Entry]
February, 2017
  • February 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 06, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 03, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2015
  • May 21, 2015: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
April, 2015
  • April 21, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.