U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:07-cr-00145-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Roy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Criminal Case Transfer]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 28, 2022: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • April 08, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 08, 2022: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 12, 2022: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
June, 2017
  • June 15, 2017: [Transcript]
May, 2017
  • May 22, 2017: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • May 19, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • May 15, 2017: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • May 15, 2017: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • May 12, 2017: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • May 11, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • May 08, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • May 08, 2017: [Amended Judgment]
  • May 08, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • May 05, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 03, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 20, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • April 11, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 24, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 16, 2017: [Continue ]
  • February 13, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • January 23, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Order]
June, 2016
  • June 23, 2016: [2255 Motion Filed]
August, 2015
  • August 12, 2015: [Instrument Returned]
April, 2015
  • April 22, 2015: [Order of Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.