U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00060-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Anquillare
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2016
  • April 03, 2016: [Transcript]
November, 2015
  • November 03, 2015: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • November 03, 2015: [Judgment]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • October 29, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • October 29, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 29, 2015: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • October 28, 2015: [Exhibit]
September, 2015
  • September 29, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 28, 2015: [Order]
  • September 25, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • September 25, 2015: [Seal]
  • September 25, 2015: [Sealed Document]
August, 2015
  • August 26, 2015: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • August 26, 2015: [Sealed Document]
July, 2015
  • July 28, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 28, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
June, 2015
  • June 19, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • June 18, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
April, 2015
  • April 22, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.