U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00028-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Torrance
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: [Early Termination of Probation]
November, 2017
  • November 06, 2017: [Prob 12F Modification of Monetary Condition]
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2017
  • January 24, 2017: [Restitution Order]
  • January 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • January 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
November, 2016
  • November 04, 2016: [Transcript]
  • November 03, 2016: [Order]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 30, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • September 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 16, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 06, 2016: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2016
  • August 08, 2016: [Hearing ]
  • August 08, 2016: [Order]
May, 2016
  • May 09, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 06, 2016: [In Chambers Conference]
  • May 05, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 28, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 21, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2016
  • January 22, 2016: [Continue ]
  • January 06, 2016: [Transcript]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • November 23, 2015: [Judgment]
  • November 10, 2015: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • November 10, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 10, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • November 10, 2015: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • November 06, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 01, 2015: [Sealed Motion]
  • November 01, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2015
  • October 09, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 09, 2015: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • October 08, 2015: [Sealed Motion]
July, 2015
  • July 09, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2015
  • June 30, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 30, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
April, 2015
  • April 24, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.