U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00062-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DB Group Services UK Limited
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Transcript]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • April 18, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • April 18, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • April 18, 2017: [Judgment]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • March 21, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [Order]
  • February 10, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 10, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • February 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 27, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 27, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2016
  • August 24, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • August 18, 2016: [Continue ]
February, 2016
  • February 17, 2016: [Order of Transfer]
  • February 16, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • February 12, 2016: [Continue ]
September, 2015
  • September 03, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 03, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • September 03, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
August, 2015
  • August 24, 2015: [Continue ]
June, 2015
  • June 30, 2015: [Certificate of Good Standing]
April, 2015
  • April 24, 2015: [Order Referring Plea]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.