U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00064-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gallo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 10, 2020: [Amended Judgment]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • January 31, 2020: [Seal]
  • January 31, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 31, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Transcript]
October, 2017
  • October 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
March, 2016
  • March 11, 2016: [Writ Returned]
February, 2016
  • February 18, 2016: [Writ Returned]
January, 2016
  • January 12, 2016: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
November, 2015
  • November 16, 2015: [Writ Issued]
  • November 13, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • November 13, 2015: [Seal]
  • November 13, 2015: [Application for Writ]
  • November 13, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2015
  • August 27, 2015: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • August 27, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 27, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • August 20, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 16, 2015: [Transcript]
  • August 14, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 14, 2015: [Leave to File]
  • August 14, 2015: [Seal]
  • August 14, 2015: [Sealed Document]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [Exhibit]
  • July 31, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 29, 2015: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • July 29, 2015: [Order on Motion for Release of Brady Materials]
  • July 29, 2015: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • July 29, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • July 28, 2015: [Order on Motion for Release of Brady Materials]
  • July 28, 2015: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • July 28, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 27, 2015: [Hearing ]
  • July 27, 2015: [Withdraw Document]
  • July 21, 2015: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • July 17, 2015: [Disclosure ]
  • July 15, 2015: [Brady Materials]
  • July 08, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 08, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 08, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 06, 2015: [Continue ]
  • July 06, 2015: [Extension of Time]
April, 2015
  • April 28, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.