U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00065-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bridges
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Travel]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Travel ]
September, 2015
  • September 14, 2015: [Forfeiture of Property ]
July, 2015
  • July 23, 2015: [Judgment]
  • July 23, 2015: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • July 23, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • July 20, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • July 15, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • July 13, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 13, 2015: [Seal]
  • July 13, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • July 08, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 06, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
June, 2015
  • June 30, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 30, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • June 18, 2015: [Forfeiture of Property ]
April, 2015
  • April 28, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.