U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00063-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gilliam
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Order]
June, 2021
  • June 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • June 07, 2021: [Withdraw Document]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 27, 2021: [Release from Custody ]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Order Returning Submission]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 20, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 09, 2020: [Notice]
  • October 06, 2020: [Letter]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • July 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • July 22, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 17, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 02, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
  • July 02, 2020: [Reconsideration]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 24, 2020: [Continue ]
  • June 19, 2020: [2255 Motion Filed]
  • June 01, 2020: [Release from Custody ]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 28, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 26, 2020: [Letter]
  • May 26, 2020: [Reconsideration]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • April 27, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 24, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • April 24, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 21, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 21, 2020: [Order to Show Cause]
  • April 20, 2020: [Release from Custody ]
April, 2018
  • April 04, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2017
  • April 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • April 13, 2017: [Seal]
  • April 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • April 06, 2017: [Unseal Case]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Transcript]
  • March 22, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • March 22, 2017: [Transcript]
  • March 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document ]
  • March 08, 2017: [Unseal Document]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [Transcript]
  • February 06, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • January 25, 2017: [Restitution Order]
  • January 24, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 11, 2017: [Restitution Order]
  • January 09, 2017: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • January 09, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • December 21, 2016: [Letter]
  • December 15, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 12, 2016: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • December 09, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 08, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 05, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • December 05, 2016: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • December 05, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • December 05, 2016: [Judgment]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 29, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • November 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • November 29, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 29, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • November 29, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • November 22, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 16, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2016
  • October 12, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • September 27, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 08, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2016
  • August 01, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • July 28, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • July 28, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 28, 2016: [Consent Form]
  • July 28, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 28, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 25, 2016: [Order Returning Submission]
  • July 21, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • July 18, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 18, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 01, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 01, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2016
  • June 13, 2016: [Psychiatric Report]
  • June 13, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 10, 2016: [Order]
February, 2016
  • February 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 01, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2015
  • December 15, 2015: [Order]
November, 2015
  • November 20, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 20, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 17, 2015: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 10, 2015: [Dismiss ]
October, 2015
  • October 21, 2015: [Order]
  • October 21, 2015: [Status Conference]
August, 2015
  • August 19, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2015
  • July 14, 2015: [Order]
June, 2015
  • June 29, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • June 23, 2015: [Status Conference]
May, 2015
  • May 05, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.