U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00056-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Incorvaia
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 07, 2017: [Travel ]
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 23, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 23, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 15, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 13, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • March 02, 2017: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • April 28, 2016: [Travel ]
August, 2015
  • August 12, 2015: [Judgment]
  • August 12, 2015: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • August 11, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 11, 2015: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • August 11, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • August 10, 2015: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • August 10, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • August 05, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2015
  • July 30, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 23, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 23, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
June, 2015
  • June 22, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2015
  • May 12, 2015: [Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.