U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:04-cr-00033-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Serpico
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
July, 2015
  • July 09, 2015: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • July 08, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 08, 2015: [Writ of Garnishment]
  • July 06, 2015: [Writ Returned]
June, 2015
  • June 22, 2015: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
May, 2015
  • May 13, 2015: [Sealed Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.