U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00093-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Strong
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • January 27, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 19, 2022: [USCA Order]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Transcript]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to proceed IFP]
  • March 20, 2020: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • March 20, 2020: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • March 19, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 19, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • March 18, 2020: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • March 10, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
November, 2019
  • November 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • November 06, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • November 06, 2019: [Seal]
  • November 06, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Transcript]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: [Transcript]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Transcript]
  • August 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Conference]
  • August 07, 2019: [Continue ]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Conference]
February, 2019
  • February 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 07, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
January, 2019
  • January 17, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: [Transcript]
  • December 12, 2018: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • December 12, 2018: [Violation Report]
  • December 12, 2018: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • December 04, 2018: [Continue ]
November, 2018
  • November 01, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 01, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 01, 2018: [Bond Hearing]
  • November 01, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Transcript]
  • October 30, 2018: [Continue ]
  • October 15, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 11, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 05, 2018: [Bond Hearing]
  • October 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • October 05, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: [Release from Custody ]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [USM Return Executed]
  • August 09, 2018: [Order]
  • August 06, 2018: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • August 03, 2018: [Surety Information Sheet]
  • August 03, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 03, 2018: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • August 03, 2018: [Bond]
  • August 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • August 03, 2018: [Bond Hearing]
  • August 03, 2018: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
  • August 03, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • August 03, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 03, 2018: [Consent Form]
  • August 02, 2018: [Reply/Response Misc]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 26, 2018: [Bond]
  • July 02, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 02, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 02, 2018: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • July 02, 2018: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 18, 2018: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 18, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 09, 2018: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2016
  • June 15, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • June 15, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • June 15, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
May, 2016
  • May 11, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • May 11, 2016: [Judgment]
  • May 11, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • May 04, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 04, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • May 04, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2016
  • April 21, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
October, 2015
  • October 26, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 26, 2015: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • October 26, 2015: [Bond]
  • October 26, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • October 26, 2015: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • October 26, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 26, 2015: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • October 20, 2015: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 08, 2015: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
September, 2015
  • September 21, 2015: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
August, 2015
  • August 20, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 20, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • August 20, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 17, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 14, 2015: [Extension of Time]
  • August 11, 2015: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • August 07, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 07, 2015: [Sealed Motion]
July, 2015
  • July 02, 2015: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
June, 2015
  • June 19, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
  • June 19, 2015: [Application for Search Warrant]
  • June 19, 2015: [Search Warrant Issued ]
  • June 19, 2015: [Order]
  • June 12, 2015: [Order]
  • June 12, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • June 12, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.