U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:11-cr-00184-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Alicea et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2016
  • November 09, 2016: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • October 19, 2016: [Passport Returned]
  • October 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PreTrial ]
  • October 17, 2016: [Return of Passport]
  • October 05, 2016: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • October 05, 2016: [Return of Passport]
June, 2015
  • June 17, 2015: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.