U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00100-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Torres
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2016
  • July 07, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 24, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • June 24, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • June 24, 2016: [Judgment]
  • June 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 23, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 23, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • June 23, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • June 23, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 22, 2016: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • June 09, 2016: [Continue ]
  • June 06, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 23, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 23, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2016
  • March 18, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 18, 2016: [Order]
  • March 17, 2016: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • March 17, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • March 17, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 17, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 17, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 17, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 17, 2016: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • March 17, 2016: [Consent Form]
  • March 17, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 17, 2016: [Information - Felony]
  • March 17, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • March 14, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 07, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
February, 2016
  • February 11, 2016: [Order Referring Plea]
  • February 05, 2016: [Continue ]
  • February 02, 2016: [Continue ]
January, 2016
  • January 13, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
November, 2015
  • November 12, 2015: [Continue ]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Continue ]
September, 2015
  • September 25, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 25, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 23, 2015: [Continue ]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • July 31, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 28, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 09, 2015: [Appear]
  • July 08, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2015
  • June 18, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 18, 2015: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 18, 2015: [Indictment Unsealed]
  • June 18, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.