U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:10-cr-00056-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sanderson et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 27, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 20, 2022: [Dismiss ]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 03, 2022: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Sealed Order]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • February 10, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • February 04, 2022: [Seal]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • May 10, 2021: [Seal]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 02, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 31, 2021: [Order on Miscelleneous Motion re Reduction of Sentence USSC Amendment]
  • March 31, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 31, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • March 22, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
  • March 22, 2021: [Seal]
  • March 22, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 22, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 08, 2021: [Miscellaneous Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence - USSC Amendment]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • February 10, 2021: [Calendar Entry]
  • February 10, 2021: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • February 09, 2021: [Leave to File]
  • February 01, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2020
  • December 09, 2020: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
August, 2020
  • August 04, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • August 04, 2020: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 30, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 30, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
April, 2020
  • April 15, 2020: [Continue ]
  • April 13, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • April 13, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2020
  • January 08, 2020: [Continue ]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [ExParte Motion]
  • November 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 12, 2019: [Continue ]
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • May 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • May 15, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 15, 2019: [Travel ]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [USM Return Executed]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Order]
  • February 20, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • February 20, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • February 12, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • February 12, 2019: [Violation Report]
  • February 11, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • February 08, 2019: [Order]
  • February 06, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • February 06, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • February 06, 2019: [Calendar Entry]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [Order on ExParte Motion]
  • July 23, 2018: [ExParte Motion]
April, 2018
  • April 13, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
June, 2015
  • June 22, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.