U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00111-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Alfonso
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Travel]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Travel ]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Prob 12F Modification of Monetary Condition]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 20, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 11, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • December 21, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 20, 2019: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • December 20, 2019: [Judgment]
  • December 06, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • December 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • December 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • December 06, 2019: [Sentencing]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 26, 2019: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • November 19, 2019: [Sealed Motion]
  • November 19, 2019: [Seal]
  • November 19, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 11, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 08, 2019: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • November 08, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • August 20, 2019: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 20, 2019: [Continue ]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • July 19, 2019: [Continue ]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: [Order of Transfer]
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 21, 2017: [Order]
July, 2017
  • July 19, 2017: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 14, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 25, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • August 31, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • August 24, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 19, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 19, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
July, 2016
  • July 15, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • July 13, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 08, 2016: [Continue ]
February, 2016
  • February 19, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • February 18, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • February 12, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • February 10, 2016: [Order]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 27, 2016: [Continue ]
June, 2015
  • June 30, 2015: [Transcript]
  • June 29, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 24, 2015: [Information - Felony]
  • June 24, 2015: [Waiver of Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.