U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:92-cr-00032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Northrop
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order of Transfer]
  • May 06, 2025: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 02, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • May 02, 2025: [Seal]
  • May 02, 2025: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Order Returning Submission]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 11, 2020: [Dismiss ]
January, 2020
  • January 07, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Sealed Document]
October, 2019
  • October 02, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • October 02, 2019: [Sealed Motion]
  • October 02, 2019: [Reconsideration]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 30, 2019: [Order Returning Submission]
  • August 29, 2019: [Order Returning Submission]
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: [Order Returning Submission]
December, 2016
  • December 07, 2016: [Order]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2016
  • June 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • June 17, 2016: [Default Judgment]
  • June 17, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2016
  • March 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 22, 2016: [Index to Record on Appeal]
  • March 22, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory]
  • March 22, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • March 21, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 07, 2016: [Order]
February, 2016
  • February 01, 2016: [Response]
January, 2016
  • January 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 14, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
December, 2015
  • December 29, 2015: [Order]
  • December 29, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 28, 2015: [Order]
November, 2015
  • November 04, 2015: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • November 04, 2015: [Order on Motion to Strike ]
  • November 04, 2015: [Order of Transfer-USCA]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 16, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
July, 2015
  • July 30, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • July 13, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.