U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-00113-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Peralta et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Writ Issued]
  • April 23, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 22, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • April 22, 2025: [Seal]
  • April 22, 2025: [Application for Writ]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Writ Returned]
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: [Writ Issued]
  • October 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • October 18, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • October 18, 2018: [Seal]
  • October 18, 2018: [Application for Writ]
February, 2016
  • February 01, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
November, 2015
  • November 18, 2015: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 18, 2015: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • November 03, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2015
  • August 28, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
  • August 26, 2015: [Continue ]
  • August 24, 2015: [Violation Report]
  • August 24, 2015: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • August 19, 2015: [Arrest ]
  • August 19, 2015: [Pretrial Detention]
  • August 19, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • August 19, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 19, 2015: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 19, 2015: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • August 19, 2015: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 21, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 15, 2015: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • July 15, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • July 15, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.