U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00119-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vasquez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Notice of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • January 21, 2020: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • January 21, 2020: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 07, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2018
  • January 16, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
June, 2017
  • June 21, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 21, 2017: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • June 21, 2017: [Judgment]
  • June 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 20, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 20, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • June 19, 2017: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 19, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 05, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 22, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • May 22, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2017
  • March 16, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Judgment]
  • January 24, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 23, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • January 23, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 23, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • January 23, 2017: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • January 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 11, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 09, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 04, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2016
  • December 27, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 27, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
November, 2016
  • November 16, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • November 15, 2016: [Continue ]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • September 20, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 20, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 20, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 16, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
  • September 09, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2016
  • July 19, 2016: [Order]
  • July 15, 2016: [Order]
  • July 11, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 05, 2016: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • July 01, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 30, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 28, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 23, 2016: [Transcript]
  • June 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
April, 2016
  • April 07, 2016: [Continue ]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • March 29, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 18, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 17, 2016: [Order]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • February 25, 2016: [Continue ]
  • February 19, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 19, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 19, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 09, 2016: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 05, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • February 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 04, 2016: [Continue ]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 28, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 27, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • January 26, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • January 25, 2016: [Suppress]
  • January 25, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2015
  • December 28, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 28, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 28, 2015: [Surety Information Sheet]
  • December 28, 2015: [Bond]
  • December 28, 2015: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • December 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • December 23, 2015: [Bond Hearing]
  • December 23, 2015: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
  • December 23, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 11, 2015: [Release from Custody ]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • November 23, 2015: [Surety Information Sheet]
  • November 23, 2015: [Bond Hearing]
  • November 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • November 23, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 17, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • November 03, 2015: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 02, 2015: [Release from Custody ]
August, 2015
  • August 07, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 03, 2015: [Discovery]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 24, 2015: [Extension of Time]
  • July 21, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 20, 2015: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.