U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00128-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bent
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 10, 2018: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • July 02, 2018: [Writ Returned]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • June 13, 2018: [Sealed Order]
  • June 01, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • June 01, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Transcript]
December, 2015
  • December 11, 2015: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • December 11, 2015: [Judgment]
  • December 04, 2015: [Sentencing]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 19, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • November 19, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 03, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2015
  • July 22, 2015: [Waiver/Plea Hearing]
  • July 22, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 22, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 22, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 22, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 22, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 22, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • July 22, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.