U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:07-cr-00158-5
  • Case Name: USA v. Morse et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion for Order]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Prob 35 Order Term Probation / SR]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • September 04, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • August 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • August 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 26, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • August 26, 2020: [Seal]
  • August 26, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 26, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • April 20, 2020: [Early Termination of Probation]
May, 2018
  • May 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Continue ]
  • April 25, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [USM Return Executed]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 31, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 31, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 31, 2018: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • January 22, 2018: [Calendar Entry]
  • January 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 22, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
October, 2017
  • October 02, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2015
  • August 13, 2015: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
July, 2015
  • July 23, 2015: [USCA Mandate]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.