U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00097-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Colon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Travel ]
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2019
  • November 08, 2019: [Order to Show Cause]
October, 2019
  • October 07, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
October, 2015
  • October 26, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • October 14, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 01, 2015: [Order on Motion to Travel]
September, 2015
  • September 18, 2015: [Travel ]
  • September 14, 2015: [Sealed Document]
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 11, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 11, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
July, 2015
  • July 23, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.