U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:09-cr-00245-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dalicandro
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 14, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
September, 2016
  • September 22, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • September 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 19, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 19, 2016: [Sealed Document]
May, 2016
  • May 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 06, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
April, 2016
  • April 11, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 11, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2016
  • March 22, 2016: [Order]
February, 2016
  • February 11, 2016: [Index to Record on Appeal]
  • February 10, 2016: [Index to Record on Appeal]
  • February 01, 2016: [USCA Appeal Fees]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • January 15, 2016: [Order]
August, 2015
  • August 14, 2015: [Sealed Motion]
  • August 13, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • August 13, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
July, 2015
  • July 27, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • July 24, 2015: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.