U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:10-cr-00005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Termini
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 04, 2018: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • May 01, 2018: [Writ Returned]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Writ Returned]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • February 13, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • February 12, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • February 12, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
  • February 05, 2018: [Sealed Document]
April, 2016
  • April 14, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • January 15, 2016: [Order]
August, 2015
  • August 13, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
July, 2015
  • July 27, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • July 24, 2015: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.