U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00126-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fox
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2016
  • September 13, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
August, 2016
  • August 09, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • August 09, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • August 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 08, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • August 04, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • August 04, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • August 02, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 01, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 28, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 15, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 15, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
May, 2016
  • May 12, 2016: [Continue ]
  • May 12, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • March 31, 2016: [Consent Form]
  • March 31, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 31, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 31, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 04, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • February 26, 2016: [Continue ]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 17, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 04, 2015: [Continue ]
September, 2015
  • September 11, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
August, 2015
  • August 20, 2015: [Continue ]
July, 2015
  • July 28, 2015: [Indictment Unsealed]
  • July 27, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • July 27, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 27, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 27, 2015: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • July 27, 2015: [Surety Information Sheet]
  • July 27, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 27, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 27, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
  • July 27, 2015: [Bond]
  • July 27, 2015: [Arrest ]
  • July 27, 2015: [Unseal Case]
  • July 27, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 27, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • July 27, 2015: [Bond Hearing]
  • July 27, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 27, 2015: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
  • July 27, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 27, 2015: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • July 27, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 27, 2015: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.