U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00055-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Page
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Early Termination of Probation]
March, 2021
  • March 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • March 04, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [Stipulation]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 29, 2021: [Release from Custody ]
  • January 22, 2021: [Order]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 18, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • December 10, 2020: [Docket Annotation]
  • December 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [2255 Motion Filed]
  • November 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • November 13, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • November 13, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • November 13, 2020: [Seal]
  • November 11, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 01, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
June, 2020
  • June 11, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal ]
  • June 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 09, 2020: [Leave to Appeal ]
  • June 09, 2020: [Extension of Time]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
  • December 04, 2019: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • December 04, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
September, 2019
  • September 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • September 04, 2019: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Order]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • November 13, 2018: [Withdraw Document]
April, 2018
  • April 05, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 23, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 03, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 20, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 20, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 14, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 07, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 06, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Transcript]
  • November 20, 2017: [Order]
  • November 01, 2017: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 20, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 20, 2017: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • October 20, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • October 20, 2017: [Judgment]
  • October 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • October 20, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • October 20, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 19, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 17, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 17, 2017: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • October 16, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • October 16, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • October 13, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • October 13, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • October 13, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 12, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • October 12, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • October 04, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • October 04, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
July, 2017
  • July 18, 2017: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • July 10, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 07, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Sealed Order]
  • April 19, 2017: [Order]
February, 2017
  • February 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 03, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
August, 2016
  • August 04, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2016
  • July 20, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • July 18, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • July 13, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • July 13, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2016
  • June 21, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Order]
  • May 23, 2016: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • May 10, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • May 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2016
  • April 01, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2016
  • February 03, 2016: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • February 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
January, 2016
  • January 20, 2016: [Forfeiture of Property ]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 19, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 09, 2015: [Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 29, 2015: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 29, 2015: [Status Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.