U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:07-cr-00297-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moore
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 06, 2018: [Order]
November, 2017
  • November 15, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2016
  • September 14, 2016: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • September 01, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
August, 2016
  • August 22, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • August 22, 2016: [Violation Report]
  • August 08, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2016
  • February 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 09, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 09, 2016: [Continue ]
December, 2015
  • December 02, 2015: [Continue ]
September, 2015
  • September 29, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 25, 2015: [Violation Report]
  • September 25, 2015: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
August, 2015
  • August 05, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • August 05, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • August 04, 2015: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • August 04, 2015: [Arrest ]
  • August 04, 2015: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 04, 2015: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • August 04, 2015: [Order of Detention]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.