U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:00-cr-00135-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Zappala
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 20, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • September 20, 2021: [Seal]
  • September 20, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 20, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Writ Returned]
  • March 06, 2020: [Writ Returned]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • February 25, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 19, 2020: [Order]
  • February 18, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 18, 2020: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 13, 2020: [Hearing ]
  • February 13, 2020: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [Writ Issued]
  • December 11, 2019: [Application for Writ]
  • December 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • December 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • December 10, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • December 09, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • December 09, 2019: [Withdraw Document]
  • December 04, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • December 04, 2019: [Seal]
  • December 04, 2019: [Application for Writ]
October, 2015
  • October 14, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
August, 2015
  • August 04, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.