U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00140-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bergen
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 03, 2020: [Order]
  • April 02, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Seal]
  • March 30, 2020: [Order]
  • March 30, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2019
  • September 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Order]
  • August 21, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2016
  • November 15, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 07, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • November 07, 2016: [Judgment]
  • November 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 03, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • November 03, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 03, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 02, 2016: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • November 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2016
  • August 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 20, 2016: [Hearing ]
June, 2016
  • June 02, 2016: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • June 01, 2016: [Sentencing]
May, 2016
  • May 19, 2016: [Exhibit]
  • May 19, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • May 19, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 19, 2016: [Seal]
  • May 18, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 11, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 11, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • May 05, 2016: [Continue ]
April, 2016
  • April 18, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2016
  • March 08, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 07, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • March 07, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 07, 2016: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • March 07, 2016: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
February, 2016
  • February 19, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 18, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
August, 2015
  • August 05, 2015: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.