U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00142-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McKenzie
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 02, 2017: [Order]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Transcript]
February, 2017
  • February 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 14, 2017: [Order]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 16, 2016: [Order]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • November 28, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 15, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • November 15, 2016: [Judgment]
  • November 15, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • November 14, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
October, 2016
  • October 18, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 11, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • September 30, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 12, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2016
  • August 03, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 03, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • August 03, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • August 03, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 03, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 03, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2016
  • March 15, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 14, 2016: [Continue ]
December, 2015
  • December 22, 2015: [Status Conference]
November, 2015
  • November 12, 2015: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 09, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 03, 2015: [Order of Transfer]
October, 2015
  • October 16, 2015: [Order]
  • October 09, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
  • October 01, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
September, 2015
  • September 11, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 09, 2015: [Sealed Order]
  • September 04, 2015: [Seal]
  • September 04, 2015: [Sealed Motion]
August, 2015
  • August 20, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • August 11, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • August 05, 2015: [Indictment]
  • August 05, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.