U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:98-cr-00043-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Taylor
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • July 15, 2022: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Writ Returned]
  • December 08, 2020: [Writ Returned]
  • December 02, 2020: [Writ Returned]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • October 21, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • October 21, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
  • October 21, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2015
  • October 21, 2015: [Writ Returned]
September, 2015
  • September 04, 2015: [Writ Issued]
  • September 03, 2015: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • September 01, 2015: [Application for Writ]
  • September 01, 2015: [Seal]
  • September 01, 2015: [Sealed Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.