U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:11-cr-00101-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mongillo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Stipulation]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 10, 2021: [Hearing ]
  • September 10, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Prob 12A(1) Modification of Monetary Condition]
September, 2015
  • September 17, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 08, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.