U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00177-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Faison
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 21, 2017: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • June 21, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • June 21, 2017: [Judgment]
  • June 21, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • June 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 21, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 21, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • June 21, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 21, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • June 21, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 21, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • June 21, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • June 20, 2017: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 12, 2017: [Sealed Order]
May, 2017
  • May 22, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • May 22, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 11, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • May 11, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2017
  • April 18, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Bond Hearing]
  • March 15, 2017: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • March 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 09, 2017: [Continue ]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Order]
  • February 21, 2017: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • February 21, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • February 21, 2017: [Consent Form]
  • February 21, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 21, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 21, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 13, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 08, 2017: [Continue ]
January, 2017
  • January 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 11, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 10, 2017: [Continue ]
  • January 06, 2017: [Order Referring Plea]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 25, 2016: [Continue ]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 26, 2016: [Continue ]
May, 2016
  • May 26, 2016: [Notice]
  • May 11, 2016: [PS 8 Petition Action on Cond of PT Release]
  • May 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 27, 2016: [Continue ]
  • April 08, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2016
  • March 17, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • March 09, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Continue ]
December, 2015
  • December 29, 2015: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 23, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 22, 2015: [Continue ]
November, 2015
  • November 20, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • November 19, 2015: [Order]
  • November 13, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 10, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 10, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 10, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 10, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • November 02, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
October, 2015
  • October 27, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
  • October 22, 2015: [Continue ]
  • October 14, 2015: [Surety Information Sheet]
  • October 14, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 14, 2015: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • October 14, 2015: [Bond]
  • October 08, 2015: [Arrest ]
  • October 08, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 08, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 08, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • October 08, 2015: [Bond Hearing]
  • October 08, 2015: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 08, 2015: [Indictment Unsealed]
  • October 08, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 08, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 08, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • October 08, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.