U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00159-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Joiner
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2021
  • April 08, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2021
  • February 12, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2020
  • November 12, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 10, 2020: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • November 10, 2020: [Violation Report]
March, 2020
  • March 12, 2020: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 10, 2020: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • March 10, 2020: [Violation Report]
  • March 06, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • March 06, 2020: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
August, 2016
  • August 15, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 05, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • August 05, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 04, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • August 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • August 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 04, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • August 04, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 04, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • August 04, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • August 04, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 04, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2016
  • July 31, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 22, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 07, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • July 07, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2016
  • June 16, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 11, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • May 09, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 09, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 09, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 06, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 04, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • May 03, 2016: [PS 8 Petition Action on Cond of PT Release]
April, 2016
  • April 01, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2016
  • March 14, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2016
  • February 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 09, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 08, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 03, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2015
  • November 06, 2015: [Speedy Trial Excludable Start]
  • November 06, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 05, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • November 05, 2015: [Surety Information Sheet]
  • November 05, 2015: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • November 05, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 05, 2015: [Bond]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Bond Hearing]
  • October 29, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 27, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
  • October 22, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 22, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 21, 2015: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.