U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:11-cr-00169-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kennedy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • June 22, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • June 22, 2016: [Violation Report]
  • June 21, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • June 21, 2016: [Violation Report]
March, 2016
  • March 07, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2016
  • February 17, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 04, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 03, 2016: [Order]
January, 2016
  • January 25, 2016: [Order of Transfer]
October, 2015
  • October 23, 2015: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.