U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:10-cr-00229-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Buchholz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
October, 2020
  • October 08, 2020: [Hearing ]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Writ Returned]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Order]
  • March 20, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • March 20, 2020: [Writ Returned]
  • March 19, 2020: [Hearing ]
February, 2020
  • February 04, 2020: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • January 15, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • January 15, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [USM Return Unexecuted]
  • November 03, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • November 02, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • November 02, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • November 01, 2017: [Sealed Document]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
June, 2017
  • June 07, 2017: [USM Return Unexecuted]
May, 2017
  • May 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • May 12, 2017: [Writ Issued]
  • May 11, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • May 11, 2017: [Seal]
  • May 11, 2017: [Application for Writ]
March, 2016
  • March 15, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • February 23, 2016: [Violation Report]
  • February 23, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • February 22, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • February 22, 2016: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
  • February 22, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 12, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • February 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 22, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.