U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Galloway
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 12, 2017: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Instrument Returned]
  • May 01, 2017: [Instrument Returned]
November, 2016
  • November 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Exoneration of Bond]
  • November 07, 2016: [Exoneration of Bond]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.