U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-50447
  • Case Name: Robert Wilkinson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 21, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [Employ]
  • March 20, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [Digital Audio Recording]
  • March 20, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [Hearing Held]
  • March 19, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [Notice]
  • March 16, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [Order]
  • March 16, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [Request for Telephonic Hearing]
  • March 12, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [U. S. Trustee Consent/Objection]
  • March 02, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [Notice of Hearing Set]
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [Employ]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [Appointment of Trustee]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • July 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Discharging Debtor - auto docket]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • June 09, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Employ]
  • June 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Digital Audio Recording]
  • June 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Hearing Held]
May, 2017
  • May 27, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Closed]
  • May 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Debtor's Certification Re Financial Management Course Completion]
  • May 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Notice of Assets]
  • May 24, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Report of Assets]
  • May 23, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Statement of U.S. Trustee - No Objection]
  • May 23, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Financial Management Course Certificate - eFinCert]
  • May 19, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Certificate of Service]
  • May 19, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Notice of Hearing Set]
  • May 17, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Employ]
  • May 05, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Statement of Intent]
  • May 05, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • May 05, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Schedules AB-J]
  • May 05, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • May 05, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Amended Schedules/Amended List of Creditors]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 26, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 24, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Deficiency Notice/Notice of Dismissal]
  • April 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • April 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Form 122]
  • April 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Form 122]
  • April 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [none]
  • April 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [none]
  • April 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.